EP1612804 - Multi-bit magnetic random access memory element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton Texas 75006-5039 / US | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frey, Christophe 17 allee des Eyminees 38240 Meylan / FR | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 05254099.4 | 29.06.2005 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | US20040881746 | 30.06.2004 Original published format: US 881746 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1612804 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1612804 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1612804 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/56, G11C11/16 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
G11C11/16 (EP,US);
G11C11/5607 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/01] |
Former [2006/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Magnetischer RAM Speicher (MRAM) mit mehr als einem Bit pro Speicherzelle | [2006/01] | English: | Multi-bit magnetic random access memory element | [2006/01] | French: | Mémoire RAM magnétorésistive (MRAM) avec mémorisation multibit par cellule | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 15.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.02.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 16.02.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.08.2009 | [2011/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11354728 ; | [X]US2002027803 (MATSUI NORIYUKI [JP]); | [X]EP1320104 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) | Examination | EP1148511 |