EP1621878 - Apparatus for testing a component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tenley, Brenda Catherine 6395 S. Snowmass Drive Liberty Township OH 45011 / US | 02 /
Dziech, Michael Leonard 3799 MacNicholas Avenue Cincinnati OH 45236 / US | 03 /
Traxler, Joseph Anthony 3766 Schroeder Drive Fairfield Township OH 45011 / US | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2013/37] |
Former [2006/05] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation, General Electric International, Inc., 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05254259.4 | 07.07.2005 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | US20040898080 | 23.07.2004 Original published format: US 898080 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1621878 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/90 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
G01N27/9013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/40] |
Former [2006/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Prüfen von einer Komponente | [2006/05] | English: | Apparatus for testing a component | [2006/05] | French: | Appareil pour controller une piéce | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 31.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/28] | 27.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4598469 (WEIXEL MARK S [US]) [A] 8* column 2, line 58 - line 63 *; | [A]US5465045 (DEROCK RICHARD [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5670879 (ZOMBO PAUL J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 38; figures 3,4 *; | [X]EP1217370 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US6608478 (DZIECH MICHAEL LEONARD [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * figures 3-5,7 * |