EP1658838 - Emulsification system for use in cosmetics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [2014/27] |
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fares, Hani 1 Rue Matisse Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | 02 /
Grosso, Rita Marie 2350 Route 10 West, Apt. A-20 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 03 /
Foltis, Sidney Peter 15 Van Riper Place Nutley, NJ 070110 / US | 04 /
Hansenne, Isabelle 639 Salter Place Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Tanty, François Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Tanty, François Cabinet Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/23] | Tanty, François Nony & Associés, 3, Rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/21] | Benson, John Everett J. A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05254363.4 | 12.07.2005 | [2006/21] | Priority number, date | US20040920615 | 18.08.2004 Original published format: US 920615 | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1658838 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1658838 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/60, A61K8/92, A61K8/49, A61Q19/00 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
A61K8/60 (EP,US);
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/4973 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/21] | Title | German: | Emulgierungssystem für kosmetische Zwecke | [2006/21] | English: | Emulsification system for use in cosmetics | [2006/21] | French: | Système d'émulsification pour usage cosmétique | [2006/21] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 19.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.07.2005 | AT | 02.07.2014 | BE | 02.07.2014 | CY | 02.07.2014 | CZ | 02.07.2014 | DK | 02.07.2014 | EE | 02.07.2014 | FI | 02.07.2014 | LT | 02.07.2014 | LV | 02.07.2014 | MC | 02.07.2014 | NL | 02.07.2014 | PL | 02.07.2014 | RO | 02.07.2014 | SE | 02.07.2014 | SI | 02.07.2014 | SK | 02.07.2014 | TR | 02.07.2014 | IE | 12.07.2014 | LU | 12.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | BG | 02.10.2014 | GR | 03.10.2014 | IS | 02.11.2014 | PT | 03.11.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 12.07.2005 | |
AT | 02.07.2014 | ||
BE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 12.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 12.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 12.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 02.07.2014 | |
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 02.07.2014 | |
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 02.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0794764 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1* examples 1,2 *; | [X]US2002035046 (LUKENBACH ELVIN R [US], et al) [X] 1-31 * example 9 *; | [A]US6551604 (BECK PETRA HELGA [GB], et al) [A] 1 * examples 4-8 *; | [X]US2003199584 (AHLUWALIA GURPREET S [US], et al) [X] 1-31 * example 12 * | Examination | EP1679063 | by applicant | US2463264 | FR2180033 | FR2326405 | FR2440933 | US4367390 | EP0114607 | US4574082 | FR2570377 | US4585597 | US4606914 | EP0199636 | EP0325540 | US5073372 | US5087445 | US5166355 | EP0517104 | WO9304665 | US5237071 | EP0570838 | EP0669323 | GB2303549 | EP0775698 | EP0796851 | EP0863145 | EP0878469 | US5843417 | DE19726184 | EP0893119 | WO9910318 | EP0933376 | WO0026167 | - SUNSCREENS - DEVELOPMENT, EVALUATION AND REGULATORY ASPECTS, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1997), pages 269 - 273 | - SEGARIN, COSMETICS AND SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1957), page 189 | - INTERNATIONAL COSMETIC INGREDIENT DICTIONARY AND HANDBOOK, (2002), pages 2954 - 2955 |