EP1617104 - Combined pulley and starter gear for an engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Petroliam Nasional Berhad Level 68, Tower 1, Petronas Twin Towers, Kuala Lumpur City Centre 50088 Kuala Lumpur / MY | [2006/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isnin, Mohamad I. Petroliam Nasional Berhad Tower 1, Petronas Twin Towers Kuala Lumpur 50088 / MY | 02 /
Mahadzir, Abdullah A., Petroliam Nasional Berhad Tower 1, Petronas Twin Towers Kuala Lumpur 50088 / MY | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Jones, John Bryn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Jones, John Bryn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 05254441.8 | 15.07.2005 | [2006/03] | Priority number, date | GB20040016021 | 16.07.2004 Original published format: GB 0416021 | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1617104 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1617104 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16H55/17, F16H55/36 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
F16H55/171 (EP);
F01L1/02 (EP);
F01L1/022 (EP);
F01L1/024 (EP);
F16H55/17 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/07] |
Former [2006/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kombination von Riemenscheibe und Anlasserrad für einen Motor | [2006/03] | English: | Combined pulley and starter gear for an engine | [2006/03] | French: | Combination de poulie et de roue dentée de démarreur pour un moteur | [2006/03] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/26] | 30.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]KR20010002319 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * abstract * [A] 13,14; | [XY]US5163394 (KOISHIKAWA KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,12,15 * abstract * [Y] 4-6,16,17; | [Y]WO8501547 (LAYCOCK ENG LTD [GB]) [Y] 4-6 * abstract *; | [Y]JPS6293666 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 16,17 * figure 4 *; | [X]JPH07278605 (HEIWA SANGYO KK) [X] 1-3,7-9,14 * abstract *; | [X]JPH11324699 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO) [X] 1-3,9 * figure - *; | [X]US6213829 (TAKAHASHI MASANORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,12,15 * figure 15 *; | [X]US2002023616 (STONE ROGER D [GB]) [X] 1-3,15 * figure 4 *; | [X]US5370563 (YAMAZAKI AKINORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * figure 3 *; | [A]US2335186 (THOMAS JACKSON) [A] 8 * figure - *; | [A]US5153032 (LANDERS PERRY E [US], et al) [A] 13 |