EP1621143 - Surgical instrument incorporating an electrically actuated pivoting articulation mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | [2006/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shelton IV, Frederick 245 East Main Street Hillsboro Ohio 45133 / US | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05254694.2 | 27.07.2005 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | US20040591694P | 28.07.2004 Original published format: US 591694 P | US20050096096 | 31.03.2005 Original published format: US 96096 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1621143 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1621143 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | [2006/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1621143 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072, A61B17/28 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/072 (KR);
A61B17/00 (KR);
A61B17/068 (KR);
A61B2017/00017 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/05] | A61B17/072 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Title | German: | Mit elektrisch aktuierter Gelenkeinrichtung versehenes, chirurgisches Instrument | [2006/05] | English: | Surgical instrument incorporating an electrically actuated pivoting articulation mechanism | [2006/05] | French: | Instrument chirurgicale avec articulation à mise en action électrique | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 22.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.01.2009 | BE | 07.01.2009 | CY | 07.01.2009 | CZ | 07.01.2009 | DK | 07.01.2009 | EE | 07.01.2009 | FI | 07.01.2009 | LT | 07.01.2009 | LV | 07.01.2009 | NL | 07.01.2009 | PL | 07.01.2009 | RO | 07.01.2009 | SI | 07.01.2009 | SK | 07.01.2009 | TR | 07.01.2009 | BG | 07.04.2009 | SE | 07.04.2009 | GR | 08.04.2009 | ES | 18.04.2009 | IS | 07.05.2009 | PT | 08.06.2009 | HU | 08.07.2009 | IE | 27.07.2009 | LU | 27.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
HU | 08.07.2009 | ||
IE | 27.07.2009 | ||
LU | 27.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
IE | 27.07.2009 | ||
LU | 27.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
IE | 27.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
IE | 27.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | NL | 07.01.2009 | |
SI | 07.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5673841 (SCHULZE DALE R [US], et al) [A] 11,12 * column 28, line 50 - column 29, line 33; figures 28,29,45,46 *; | [X]US2003065358 (FRECKER MARY I [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0101] , [0183] , [0184] *; | [A]US2003069474 (COUVILLON LUCIEN ALFRED [US]) [A] 2,4* the whole document * | by applicant | US5465895 | US5673840 | US5797537 | US5865361 | US6667825 |