EP1642510 - Seamless self-adhesive hair extension system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aderans Holdings Co., Ltd. 6-3, Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/39] |
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states ADERANS CO., LTD. 6-3 Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sthair, Okyo 1450 SW 3rd St. Suite A-9 Pompano Beach FL 33069 / US | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | Brown, David Leslie HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05254696.7 | 27.07.2005 | [2006/14] | Priority number, date | US20040954517 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: US 954517 | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1642510 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1642510 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A41G3/00 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
A41G5/008 (EP,US);
A41G5/00 (KR);
A41G3/00 (KR);
A41G5/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/14] | Title | German: | Nahtlose selbstklebende Haarverlängerungsvorrichtung | [2006/14] | English: | Seamless self-adhesive hair extension system | [2006/14] | French: | Système auto-adhésif sans couture d'extension de chevelure | [2006/14] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 24.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.04.2010 | CZ | 07.04.2010 | DK | 07.04.2010 | EE | 07.04.2010 | FI | 07.04.2010 | IT | 07.04.2010 | LT | 07.04.2010 | LV | 07.04.2010 | PL | 07.04.2010 | RO | 07.04.2010 | SI | 07.04.2010 | SK | 07.04.2010 | TR | 07.04.2010 | CY | 28.04.2010 | BG | 07.07.2010 | GR | 08.07.2010 | ES | 18.07.2010 | IE | 27.07.2010 | LU | 27.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | IS | 07.08.2010 | PT | 09.08.2010 | HU | 08.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BG | 07.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
TR | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IE | 27.07.2010 | ||
LU | 27.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
HU | 08.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BG | 07.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IE | 27.07.2010 | ||
LU | 27.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
HU | 08.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BG | 07.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IE | 27.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
HU | 08.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BG | 07.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IE | 27.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IE | 27.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | SI | 07.04.2010 | |
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | SI | 07.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5881737 (NELSON CHARLES W [US]) [DA] 1,21,22,26* the whole document *; | [DX]US2001035192 (TOWNSEND VALERIE [US]) [DX] 21-23,26,28,30,31 * the whole document *; | [X]US2001037813 (RA JAMES W [US]) [X] 21-23,30,31 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002185146 (GOLD DAVID ANTHONY [IT]) [X] 21 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5072745 | US5107867 | US5868145 | US5881737 | US6405736 |