EP1642523 - Cleaning sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Yoshinori c/o Technical Center of Uni-Charm Corporation 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | [2009/09] |
Former [2006/14] | 01 /
Tanaka, Yoshinori c/o Tech. Ctr. Uni-Charm Corp. 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | Representative(s) | Fitchett, Stuart Paul Saunders & Dolleymore LLP European Patent Attorneys 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Fitchett, Stuart Paul Saunders & Dolleymore European Patent Attorneys 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | ||
Former [2006/14] | Fitchett, Stuart Paul Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05254859.1 | 04.08.2005 | [2006/14] | Priority number, date | JP20040286321 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004286321 | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1642523 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1642523 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1642523 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47L13/20 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
A47L13/20 (EP,US);
A47L13/24 (KR);
A47L13/256 (KR);
Y10T442/601 (EP,US);
Y10T442/602 (EP,US);
Y10T442/659 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [2008/25] |
Former [2006/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Reiningungstuch | [2006/14] | English: | Cleaning sheet | [2006/14] | French: | Feuille de nettoyage | [2006/14] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 29.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 06.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9735510 (KAO CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7 * abstract *; | [X]JPH10155713 (UNI CHARM CORP) [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract *; | [X]US2003121116 (KECK LAURA ELIZABETH [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7 * paragraphs [0011] - [0028] *; | [X]US2003209263 (BELL RUSSELL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7 * paragraphs [0113] - [0135]; figures 4A-4G *; | [X]WO2004041051 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-4,7 * page 14, line 12 - page 24, line 5; figures 22-25 *; | [PX]EP1537819 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-7* paragraphs [0072] - [0080]; figures 7,8 * | by applicant | JPH011295 | JPH0322675 | JPH09182706 |