EP1623667 - A non contact measurement technique for the monitoring of a physiological condition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scalise, Lorenzo Via Astagno 27 60100 Ancona / IT | For all designated states Grigioni, Mauro Via Jenner 8 00151 Roma / IT | For all designated states Morbiducci, Umberto Corso Cavour 50 62100 Macerata / IT | For all designated states Tomasini, Enrico Primo Via Colle Sant' Angelo 38 63033 Monteprandone AP / IT | [2012/24] |
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states Scalise, Lorenzo Via Astagno 27 60100 Ancona / IT | ||
For all designated states Grigioni, Mauro Via Jenner 8 00151 Roma / IT | |||
For all designated states Morbiducci, Umberto Corso Cavour 50 62100 Macerata / IT | |||
For all designated states Tomasini, Enrico Primo Via Colle Sant' Angelo 38 63033 Monteprandone AP / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Baldi, Claudio Viale Cavallotti, 13 60035 Jesi (AN) / IT | [2012/24] |
Former [2006/27] | Baldi, Claudio Viale Cavallotti, 13 60035 Jesi (AN) / IT | ||
Former [2006/06] | Round, Edward Mark Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05254872.4 | 04.08.2005 | [2006/06] | Priority number, date | GB20040017590 | 06.08.2004 Original published format: GB 0417590 | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1623667 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1623667 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/024, A61B5/11, A61B5/0245 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
A61B5/02405 (EP);
A61B5/0245 (EP);
A61B5/1114 (EP);
A61B2503/045 (EP);
A61B2562/0233 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/06] | A61B5/024 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/46] |
Former [2006/41] | |||
Former [2006/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Technik zur kontaktlosen Überwachung eines physiologischen Zustands | [2006/06] | English: | A non contact measurement technique for the monitoring of a physiological condition | [2006/06] | French: | Technique de mesure sans contact pour surveiller l'état physiologique | [2006/06] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 30.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2006 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.09.2006 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | IS   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | LT   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | LV   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | 14.09.2006 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.09.2006 | M01   Fee paid on   05.10.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.08.2005 | AT | 13.06.2012 | BE | 13.06.2012 | CY | 13.06.2012 | CZ | 13.06.2012 | DK | 13.06.2012 | EE | 13.06.2012 | FI | 13.06.2012 | LT | 13.06.2012 | LV | 13.06.2012 | NL | 13.06.2012 | PL | 13.06.2012 | RO | 13.06.2012 | SE | 13.06.2012 | SI | 13.06.2012 | SK | 13.06.2012 | TR | 13.06.2012 | IE | 04.08.2012 | LU | 04.08.2012 | CH | 31.08.2012 | LI | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | BG | 13.09.2012 | GR | 14.09.2012 | ES | 24.09.2012 | IS | 13.10.2012 | PT | 15.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IE | 04.08.2012 | ||
LU | 04.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IE | 04.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
IE | 04.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
IE | 04.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 13.06.2012 | |
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 13.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003135097 (WIEDERHOLD MARK D [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0049] *; | [X] - MEIGAS K ET AL, "Self-mixing in a diode laser as a method for cardiovascular diagnostics", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL OPTICS SPIE USA, (200301), vol. 8, no. 1, ISSN 1083-3668, pages 152 - 160, XP002352578 [X] 1,2 * chapter 3.5: page 157, left column - page 158, left column; chapter 3.5: page 158, left column - page 159, left column figures 2,10,11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.1528949 | [A] - SCALISE L, "Self-mixing feedback Doppler vibrometry", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING SPIE-INT. SOC. OPT. ENG USA, (2002), vol. 4827, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 374 - 384, XP002352579 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.468180 | [A] - CASTELLINI P ET AL, "Application of lasers for noncontact excitation and measurement of vibration", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING SPIE-INT. SOC. OPT. ENG USA, (2000), vol. 4072, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 280 - 291, XP002352580 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.386760 | by applicant | - EUROPEAN HEART JOURNAL, (1996), vol. 17, pages 354 - 381 | - MCSHARRY PE ET AL., "A dynamical model for generating synthetic electrocardiogram signals", IEEE TRANS BIOMED ENG., (200303), vol. 50, no. 3, pages 289 - 94 | - DE BOER RW; KAREMAKER JM; STRACKEE J, "Hemodynamic fluctuations and baroreflex sensitivity in humans: a beat- to-beat model", AM J PHYSIOL, (1987), vol. 253, pages 680 - 689 |