EP1710727 - RFID transceiver device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8858 / JP | For all designated states Fujitsu Frontech Limited 1776, Yanokuchi Inagi-shi Tokyo 206-8555 / JP | [2009/22] |
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
For all designated states Fujitsu Frontech Limited 1776, Yanokuchi Inagi-shi Tokyo 206-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ninomiya, Teruhisa, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Kawasaki, Yusuke, c/o Fujitsu Frontech Limited 1776, Yanokuchi Inagi-shi Tokyo 206-8555 / JP | 03 /
Kuroda, Osamu, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Tanaka, Yoshinori, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2006/41] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2006/41] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05255049.8 | 16.08.2005 | [2006/41] | Priority number, date | JP20050111531 | 08.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005111531 | [2006/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1710727 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1710727 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00, H04B1/40, H04B1/52 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
H04B1/525 (EP,US);
G06K17/00 (KR);
G06K7/0008 (EP,US);
H04B5/48 (KR);
H04B7/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/25] |
Former [2006/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | RFID Sende-Empfangsgerät | [2006/41] | English: | RFID transceiver device | [2006/41] | French: | Emetteur-récepteur RFID | [2006/41] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 10.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0531125 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [X]GB2300318 (PLESSEY CO LTD [GB], et al); | [A]US6229992 (MCGEEHAN JOSEPH PETER [GB], et al); | [A]US6311045 (DOMOKOS JOHN [GB]); | [A]US6393259 (KUSUNOKI SHIGEO [JP]); | [XY]EP1211630 (KIPP LUDWIG [US]) | by applicant | EP0531125 | GB2300318 | EP1211630 | JP2003174388 |