EP1640982 - Optical disc and optical disc device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Memory-Tech Corporation Miyago-Azanekouchi 2193-1, Chikusei-shi Ibaraki / JP | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states Memory-Tech Corporation Miyago-Azanekouchi 2193-1, Chikusei-shi Ibaraki / JP | ||
For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otsuka, Masato, c/o Memory-Tech Corporation 27-25, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | 02 /
Sugaya, Toshihiro, c/o Toshiba Dig. Media Net. Co. Shinsugita-cho 8, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05255170.2 | 23.08.2005 | [2006/13] | Priority number, date | JP20040279847 | 27.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004279847 | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1640982 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1640982 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
G11B7/24038 (EP,US);
G11B7/24073 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/07] |
Former [2006/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optische Platte und optisches Plattengerät | [2006/13] | English: | Optical disc and optical disc device | [2006/13] | French: | Disque optique et dispositif de disque optique | [2006/13] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 28.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/22] | 11.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0520619 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 48 * * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 41 * * figures 3,4,8 *; | [A]EP0886269 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5883877 (NISHIZAWA AKIRA [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US6069868 (KASHIWAGI TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]TW407269B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US6597643 (MITCHELL DAVID T [GB], et al) [A] 6-10* the whole document *; | US6931654 [ ] (OH YOUNG-NAM [KR], et al) [ ] * the whole document * | Examination | US6650612 | - "DVD Book Construction", 20030901, (20030901), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www,dvdfllc.co.jp/bookcon.htm, (20031014), XP007912302 | - ANONYMOUS, Minutes of DVD Forum Steering Committee Meeting, 20040609; 20040609 - 20040610, PAGE(S) 1 - 14, (20040609), XP007919089 | - ANONYMOUS, Minutes of DVD Forum Steering Committee Meeting, 20040922, PAGE(S) 1 - 9, (20040922), XP007919090 | - How to order DVD Book (DVD Specifications), 20031014, PAGE(S) 1, (20031014), XP007912299 | - DVD Book Construction (1/2), 20090201, (20090201), XP007908534 |