EP1630202 - One-part organopolysiloxane gel compositions, their preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Miyuki, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd. 1-10 Oaza Hitomi Matsuida-machi Usui-gun Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Sato, Kazuyasu Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd. 1-10 Oaza Hitomi Matsuida-machi Usui-gun Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Ikeno, Masayuki, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd. 1-10 Oaza Hitomi Matsuida-machi Usui-gun Gunma-ken / JP | [2012/31] |
Former [2006/09] | 01 /
Tanaka, Miyuki, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd. 1-10 Oaza Hitomi Matsuida-machi Usui-gun Gunma-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Sato, Kazuyasu Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd. 1-10 Oaza Hitomi Matsuida-machi Usui-gun Gunma-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Ikeno, Masayuki, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd. 1-10 Oaza Hitomi Matsuida-machi Usui-gun Gunma-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05255188.4 | 24.08.2005 | [2006/09] | Priority number, date | JP20040245345 | 25.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004245345 | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1630202 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1630202 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1630202 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04, C08K5/56 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
C08K5/14 (EP,US);
C08G77/398 (EP,US);
C08K5/527 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08G77/12 (EP,US);
C08G77/20 (EP,US);
C08G77/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/14, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/527, C08L83/04 (US,EP);
C08L83/04, C08L83/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/33] |
Former [2006/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einkomponentige Organopolysiloxangelzusammensetzungen sowie deren Herstellung und Verwendung | [2006/09] | English: | One-part organopolysiloxane gel compositions, their preparation and use | [2006/09] | French: | Compositions de gel d'organopolysiloxane à un seul constituant et leur préparation et utilisation | [2006/09] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 27.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP1437382 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [DA] 1-6 * example 1 * |