EP1640421 - Methods for labelling pharmaceutical products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/13] | Labels for pharmaceutical products | ||
[2007/15] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Opposition rejected | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chinea, Vanessa I. Highway 110 N KM 5.1 Aguadilla P.R. 00605 / US | 02 /
Barreto, Marcos A. HC 04, Box 42632 Aguadilla PR 00603 / US | [2006/25] |
Former [2006/13] | 01 /
Chinea, Vanessa I. Rd. 459 Km 14.4 Int. Quintas de Atlantico 7 Isabela P.R. 00662 / US | ||
02 /
Barreto, Marcos A. HC 04, Box 42632 Aguadilla PR 00603 / US | Representative(s) | Tollett, Ian, et al Williams Powell 44 Prespect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Tollett, Ian, et al Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct London EC1A 2BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05255899.6 | 22.09.2005 | [2006/13] | Priority number, date | US20040946883 | 22.09.2004 Original published format: US 946883 | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1640421 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1640421 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00, B41F17/36, B41M3/14, A61K9/44 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
C09D11/32 (EP,US);
A61K9/2072 (EP,US);
B41J3/407 (EP,US);
B41M3/144 (EP,US);
B41M5/50 (EP,US);
C09D11/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/49] |
Former [2006/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Markierung von pharmazeutischen Produkten | [2007/15] | English: | Methods for labelling pharmaceutical products | [2007/15] | French: | Procédés de marquage des produits pharmaceutiques | [2007/15] |
Former [2006/13] | Markierungen für pharmazeutische Produkte | ||
Former [2006/13] | Labels for pharmaceutical products | ||
Former [2006/13] | Étiquettes pour des produits pharmaceutiques | Examination procedure | 15.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 13.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.08.2008
ADMISSIBLE GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstr. 159 81677 München / DE | [2008/39] | 18.09.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.01.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.11.2009 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2010/15] | 09.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.11.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.11.2009 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS5356315 ; | [XA]JPH0959145 ; | [XA]JPH11199480 ; | [XA]GB2074947 (THOMAE GMBH DR K) [X] 9 * page 1, line 6 - line 62 * * page 2, line 5 - line 17 * * page 3, line 6 - line 31; figure -; example -; claim - *[A] 1-8 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19780729), vol. 002, no. 093, Database accession no. (C - 019), & JP53056315 A 19780522 (EISAI CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3-9 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP09059145 A 19970304 (TAISHO PHARMACEUT CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3-9 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11199480 A 19990727 (NONOGAWA SHOJI KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3-9 |