EP1643134 - Cooling fan [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY One River Road Schenectady, New York 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balan, Chellappa 1012 Northwood Court Niskayuna New York 12309 / US | 02 /
Breeze-Stringfellow, Andrew 11724 Laurelview Drive Montgomery Ohio 45249 / US | 03 /
Decker, John Jared 6675 Woodsedge Drive Liberty Township Ohio 45044 / US | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2006/14] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation, General Electric International Inc., 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05255969.7 | 26.09.2005 | [2006/14] | Priority number, date | US20040955646 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: US 955646 | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1643134 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1643134 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/54 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
F04D29/542 (EP,US);
F04D25/0613 (EP,US);
F04D29/545 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2013/16] |
Former [2006/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kühllüfter | [2006/14] | English: | Cooling fan | [2006/14] | French: | Ventilateur de refroidissement | [2006/14] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/33] | 26.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5152661 (SHEETS HERMAN E [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * * figure 1 * * column 13, lines 46-65 * * column 17, lines 6-10 *; | [X]US3189260 (KONSTANTINOVICH IVANOV SERGEI) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * * figure 1 * |