EP1643498 - Optical information recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, TR | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAIYO YUDEN CO., LTD. 16-20 Ueno 6-chome, Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0005 / JP | [2008/20] |
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states Taiyoyuden Co., Ltd. 16-20, Ueno 6-chome, Taitou-ku Tokyo 110-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hara, Fumi c/o Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd. 16-20, Ueno 6-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0005 / JP | 02 /
Ishibashi, Sachiko c/o Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd. 16-20, Ueno 6-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0005 / JP | 03 /
Satoh, Masashi c/o Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd. 16-20, Ueno 6-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0005 / JP | 04 /
Fujii, Toru c/o Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd. 16-20, Ueno 6-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0005 / JP | 05 /
Arai, Yuji c/o Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd. 16-20, Ueno 6-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0005 / JP | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/14] | Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square LONDON WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05256111.5 | 29.09.2005 | [2006/14] | Priority number, date | JP20040286295 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004286295 | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1643498 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1643498 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1643498 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/258, G11B7/247 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
G11B7/258 (EP,US);
G11B7/256 (EP,US);
G11B7/24038 (EP,US);
G11B7/246 (EP,US);
G11B7/2534 (EP,US);
Y10T428/21 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/14] | G11B7/258 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/14] | Title | German: | Optisches Datenaufzeichnungsmedium | [2006/14] | English: | Optical information recording medium | [2006/14] | French: | Support d'enrégistrement optique des données | [2006/14] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 27.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.09.2008 | CY | 17.09.2008 | CZ | 17.09.2008 | DK | 17.09.2008 | EE | 17.09.2008 | FI | 17.09.2008 | LT | 17.09.2008 | LV | 17.09.2008 | PL | 17.09.2008 | RO | 17.09.2008 | SI | 17.09.2008 | SK | 17.09.2008 | TR | 17.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | BG | 17.12.2008 | SE | 17.12.2008 | ES | 28.12.2008 | IS | 17.01.2009 | HU | 18.03.2009 | [2010/39] |
Former [2010/24] | BE | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
PL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | BE | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | BE | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | BE | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | BE | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | BE | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | BE | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 17.09.2008 | |
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 17.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5545121 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [XY]US5075145 (YAMAMOTO RYOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 25 - column 5, line 32 * [Y] 3-8; | [Y]US6475589 (PAI-PARANJAPE VANDITA [US], et al) [Y] 4-8 * column 4, lines 17-38 *; | [Y]US2004161701 (HOHSAKA AYAKO [JP], et al) [Y] 3,7 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] *; | [E]EP1690958 (ISHIFUKU METAL IND [JP]) [E] 1* paragraphs [0027] - [0029] * | by applicant | JPH0969239 | - MODERN DYE DISPERSION TECHNIQUE, TECHNICAL INFORMATION SOCIETY, (1993), pages 53 - 54 |