EP1643030 - Processes for making compositions for conversion to lyocell fibers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY P.O. Box 9777 Federal Way, WA 98063-9777 / US | [2006/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Luo, Mengkui 3608 45th Avenue NE Tacoma, Washington 98422 / US | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2006/14] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road GB-London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05256125.5 | 30.09.2005 | [2006/14] | Priority number, date | US20040956914 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: US 956914 | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1643030 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1643030 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | D21C9/00, D21C9/14, D21C9/147, D21C9/16, C08B16/00, C08L1/02 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
C08L1/06 (EP,US);
C08B16/00 (EP,US);
C08L1/02 (EP,US);
D21C9/10 (EP,US);
D21C9/14 (EP,US);
D21C9/147 (EP,US);
D21C9/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FI, FR, SE [2006/50] |
Former [2006/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Zusammensetzungen für die Konvertierung zu Lyocell Fasern | [2006/14] | English: | Processes for making compositions for conversion to lyocell fibers | [2006/14] | French: | Procédé de fabrication des compositions pour la transformation en fibres de lyocell | [2006/14] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 18.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US5985097 (SAMUELSSON HANS OLOV [SE]) [YD] 1-11 * abstract * * claim 1 *; | [YD]US6210801 (LUO MENGKUI [US], et al) [YD] 1-11 * abstract * * column 7, line 53 - column 8, line 36 *; | [YD]US6235392 (LUO MENGKUI [US], et al) [YD] 1-11* the whole document *; | [Y]US6331354 (SEALEY II JAMES E [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * claim 1 *; | [PY]US2004209078 (LUO MENGKUI [US], et al) [PY] 1-11 * the whole document * |