EP1646030 - Plasma display apparatus and driving method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [2006/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ree, Byung Joon Byeoksan 1-cha, Apt. 207-903 Jukjeon-ri, Suzi-eup Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Camp, Ronald, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | Camp, Ronald, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05256305.3 | 11.10.2005 | [2006/15] | Priority number, date | KR20040081133 | 11.10.2004 Original published format: KR 2004081133 | [2006/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1646030 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1646030 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/28 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
G09G3/294 (EP,US);
G09G3/291 (KR);
G09G3/2022 (EP,US);
G09G3/2942 (EP,US);
G09G3/296 (KR);
G09G2310/066 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Title | German: | Plasmaanzeigetafel und Steuerungsverfahren | [2006/15] | English: | Plasma display apparatus and driving method thereof | [2006/15] | French: | Panneau d'affichage à plasma et procédé de commande | [2006/15] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 24.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001005188 (WATANABE TAKUYA [JP]) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0033] - [0038] - [0043] , [0050] , [0051] *; | [X]KR20020061913 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-18* the whole document *; | [X]US6466186 (SHIMIZU MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 9, line 47 - column 10, line 11; figures 10,11 * * column 15, line 65 - column 16, line 23 *; | [X]KR20040026016 (LG ELECTRONICS INC) [X] 1-18 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2001005188 | KR20020061913 | US6466186 |