EP1652486 - RF intervertebral electrosurgical probe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Garito, Jon C. 3333 Royal Avenue Oceanside New York 11572 / US | For all designated states Ellman, Alan G. 3333 Royal Avenue Oceanside New York 11572 / US | [2006/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 05256328.5 | 12.10.2005 | [2006/18] | Priority number, date | US20040978096 | 01.11.2004 Original published format: US 978096 | [2006/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1652486 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1652486 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
A61B17/32002 (EP,US);
A61B18/12 (KR);
A61B18/00 (KR);
A61B18/1402 (EP,US);
A61B2017/306 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0044 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2007/02] |
Former [2006/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrochirurgische Hochfrequenzsonde zur Anwendung im Intervertebralbereich | [2006/18] | English: | RF intervertebral electrosurgical probe | [2006/18] | French: | Sonde eléctrochirurgicale à haute frequence pour l'utilisation entre les vertébraux | [2006/18] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 16.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5743870 (EDWARDS STUART D [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1B,C *; | [A]DE19641564 (AESCULAP AG & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0998879 (ERBE ELEKTROMEDIZIN [DE]) [A] 2-13 * figure 12 *; | [X]US6530924 (ELLMAN ALAN G [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 5, lines 10-32; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2004034339 (STOLLER MARSHALL L [US], et al) [A] 2* paragraphs [0009] - [0011]; figure 7 * |