EP1650289 - Aviation gasoline formulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Petróleo Brasileiro S.A. - PETROBRAS Avenida República do Chile no 65 Rio de Janeiro, RJ 20035-900 / BR | [2012/14] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states Petroleo Brasileiro S.A. - PETROBRAS Avenida Republica do Chile no 65 Rio de Janeiro / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE OLIVEIRA, Edimilson Jesus Rua Tiradentes no. 103, Ap. 304 Ingá, Niterói, RJ / BR | 02 /
ROCHA, Mauro Iurk Rua Presidente Backer no. 54, Ap. 1301 Icaraí, Niterói, RJ / BR | [2011/31] |
Former [2006/17] | 01 /
DE OLIVEIRA, Edimilson Jesus Rua Tiradentes no. 103, Ap. 304 Ingà, Niteroi, RJ / BR | ||
02 /
ROCHA, Mauro Iurk Rue Presidente Backer no. 54, Ap. 1301 Icarai, Niteroi, RJ / BR | Representative(s) | Benson, John Everett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Benson, John Everett J. A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/17] | Benson, John Everett J. A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05256521.5 | 21.10.2005 | [2006/17] | Priority number, date | BR20040404605 | 22.10.2004 Original published format: BR 0404605 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1650289 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1650289 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/06, C10L1/14, C10L1/18, C10L1/22 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
C10L1/14 (EP,US);
C10L1/00 (EP,US);
C10L1/023 (EP,US);
C10L1/06 (EP,US);
C10L10/10 (EP,US);
C10L1/1608 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/01] |
Former [2006/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flugbenzinzusammensetzung | [2006/17] | English: | Aviation gasoline formulation | [2006/17] | French: | Composition de carburant d'aviation | [2006/17] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 17.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2006 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]RO113365 ; | [X]GB911491 (ETHYL CORP) [X] 1 * page 3, lines 5-8 *; | [XY]US3212867 (OCKERBLOOM NELSON E) [X] 1,3,4,7,11 * column 3, lines 1-8 * * column 4, lines 2-9 * * column 5, line 41 - column 6, line 7 * [Y] 2,5,6,8,10; | RO113365 [ ] (INST NATIONAL DE CERCETARI PEN [RO]) [ ] * the whole document *; | [A]US6258134 (STUDZINSKI WILLIAM M [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002026744 (GOLUBKOV ANGELICA [SE], et al) [A] 8 * paragraph [0089] *; | [Y]US2002045785 (BAZZANI ROBERTO VITTORIO [GB], et al) [Y] 2,5,6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0014] - [0078]; claims 1-118 *; | [A]US6451075 (SCHOPPE ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1-7,11 * abstract *; | [A]US2003183554 (BAZZANI ROBERTO VITTORIO [GB], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [YA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 45, Database accession no. 1998-529537, XP002366367 & RO113365 B 19980630 (INST NATIONAL DE CERCETARI PEN) [Y] 8,10 * column A * [A] 9 | Examination | - P MILLER, KITPLANES, (200606), pages 29 - 35 | by applicant | US5470358 | US5851241 | US6238446 | US6258134 | US6451075 | US6767372 |