EP1655838 - Linearity corrector using filter products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. 14200 S.W. Karl Braun Drive, P.O. Box 500 Beaverton, OR 97077 / US | [2006/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Slavin, Keith R. 8474 Chevy Place Beaverton Oregon 97008 / US | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | HGF 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05256742.7 | 31.10.2005 | [2006/19] | Priority number, date | US20040625372P | 04.11.2004 Original published format: US 625372 P | US20050258030 | 26.10.2005 Original published format: US 258030 | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1655838 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1655838 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1655838 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H03H17/00 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
H03M1/0626 (EP,US);
H03M1/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/08] |
Former [2006/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Linearitätkorrektor mit Multiplizierung von Filtern | [2006/19] | English: | Linearity corrector using filter products | [2006/19] | French: | Correcteur de linéarité avec multiplication de filtres | [2006/19] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 15.12.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 26.03.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 22.05.2008 | Appeal received | 25.07.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.09.2008 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Divisional application(s) | EP08003174.3 / EP1933459 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.01.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.01.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - KOH T ET AL, "Second-order Volterra filtering and its application to nonlinear system identification", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING USA, (198512), vol. ASSP-33, no. 6, ISSN 0096-3518, pages 1445 - 1455, XP002363898 [X] 1,3-5,8,9,16 * page 1445 - page 1449; figure 1(b) * | [X] - ZHANG JIA-SHU ET AL, "A reduced parameter second-order Volterra filter with application to nonlinear adaptive prediction of chaotic time series", ACTA PHYSICA SINICA CHINESE PHYS. SOC CHINA, (2001), vol. 50, no. 7, ISSN 1000-3290, pages 1248 - 1254, XP009060153 [X] 1,3-5,8,9,16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002]; figure 1 * | [X] - FRANK W, "Compensation of linear and nonlinear sensor distortions by digital post processing", PROCEEDINGS 7TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE FOR SENSORS TRANSDUCERS AND SYSTEMS (SENSOR 95), Germany, (1995), pages 889 - 892, XP002363900 [X] 1,16 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003]; figures 1,2 * | [AX] - FRANK W ET AL, "Realtime Loudspeaker Linearization", IEEE WINTER WORKSHOP ON NONLINEAR DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1993, Tampere, Finland, (19930117), pages 2.1.3.1 - 2.1.3.5, XP010334788 [A] 1,16 * paragraphs [0001] - [03.1]; figures 1,2,8 * [X] 10 | [AX] - KARAGIANNI K ET AL INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Efficient third-order volterra filter computation in the time domain", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 37TH. ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS, & COMPUTERS. PACIFIC GROOVE, CA, NOV. 9 - 12, 2003, ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20031109), VOL. 1 OF 2. CONF. 37, ISBN 0-7803-8104-1, pages 2180 - 2184, XP010702671 [A] 1,16 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003]; figures 1-3,6 * [X] 10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.2003.1292367 |