EP1655309 - Process for stopping continuous polymerization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2006/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamazaki, Kazuhiro 1707-19, O-machi Saijo-shi Ehime / JP | 02 /
Nishitani, Akira 2-2-164, Nishibara-cho Niihama-shi Ehime / JP | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Duckworth, Timothy John, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Duckworth, Timothy John, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/24] | Duckworth, Timothy John, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/19] | Duckett, Anthony Joseph J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05256858.1 | 04.11.2005 | [2006/19] | Priority number, date | JP20040325506 | 09.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004325506 | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1655309 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1655309 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/02, C08F2/06, C08F4/32 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
B01J19/18 (EP,US);
C08F2/01 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2/02 (EP,US);
C08F2/06 (EP,US);
C08F4/32 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00063 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00069 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00094 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00189 (EP,US);
B01J2219/002 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00225 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00231 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/03] |
Former [2006/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Beendigung eines kontinuierlichen Polymerisationsprozesses | [2006/19] | English: | Process for stopping continuous polymerization | [2006/19] | French: | Procédé pour stopper une polymérisation continue | [2006/19] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 06.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 08.12.2008 | [2012/08] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2284425 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5728793 (KUMAGAI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1-4 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5728793 | JPH0448802B | JPS5129914B | JPS5217555B | JPS6453682 | JPS6289719 | JPH0349925 |