EP1657734 - Plasma display apparatus comprising filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20 Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2006/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Kyungku, c/o Hangaram Silla Apt.404-1006 Burim-dong, Dongan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2006/21] |
Former [2006/20] | 01 /
Kim, Kyungku, c/o Hangaram Saekyeong Apt. 502-606 Burim-dong, Dongan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Camp, Ronald, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Camp, Ronald, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05256926.6 | 09.11.2005 | [2006/20] | Priority number, date | KR20040092150 | 11.11.2004 Original published format: KR 2004092150 | [2006/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1657734 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1657734 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01J17/16, H01J17/49, H05K9/00 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
H01J11/44 (EP,KR,US);
H01J11/12 (EP,US);
H05K9/0096 (EP,US);
H01J2211/446 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/20] | H01J17/06, H01J5/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Plasma-Anzeigevorrichtung mit einem Filter | [2006/20] | English: | Plasma display apparatus comprising filter | [2006/20] | French: | Appareil d'affichage à plasma avec un filtre | [2006/20] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 17.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0887834 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1-20* page 12, line 25 - page 13, line 44; figures 6a,6b *; | [X]EP0930637 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0052] , [0069] * * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0176] *; | [X]EP0963146 (GUNZE KK [JP]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0100] *; | [X]EP0998182 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,3-8,10-20 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0024] , [0043] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0070] * | by applicant | EP0930637 | EP0963146 |