EP1661780 - Aircraft brake actuation system including anti-hysteresis control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [2011/01] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states Honeywell International, Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evans, Paul S. 4284 E Reins Road Gilbert, AZ 85297 / US | 02 /
Quitmeyer, James N. 3871 S Barberry Place Chandler, AZ 85248 / US | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2006/22] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05257129.6 | 18.11.2005 | [2006/22] | Priority number, date | US20040993608 | 19.11.2004 Original published format: US 993608 | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1661780 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1661780 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/17, B60T13/74, B60T8/32 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
B60T8/1703 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/06] |
Former [2006/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hysteresisfreies Bremssteuerungsystem für ein Flugzeug | [2006/22] | English: | Aircraft brake actuation system including anti-hysteresis control | [2006/22] | French: | Systèm de commande de freinage sans hystérésis pour aéronef | [2006/22] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 27.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10177791.0 / EP2263924 | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6480130 (HANSON MARK B [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 8 - line 57 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,4 * [A] 2,7; | [A]US4078845 (AMBERG ROBERT LEO, et al) [A] 1 * claim 28 * |