EP1662448 - Gaming Machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Entertainment Corporation Ariake Frontier Building, Tower A 3-7-26 Ariake, Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states Universal Entertainment Corporation Ariake Frontier Building, Tower A, 3-7-26 Ariake, Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states Aruze Corporation 1-25, Ariake 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0063 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Kazuo Aruze Corporation 3-1-25 Ariake Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0063 / JP | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05257274.0 | 25.11.2005 | [2006/22] | Priority number, date | JP20040344319 | 29.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004344319 | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1662448 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/32 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
A63F13/79 (KR);
A63F5/04 (KR);
G07F17/32 (EP,US);
G07F17/3237 (EP,US);
G07F17/3239 (EP,US);
G07F17/3255 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Title | German: | Spielautomat | [2006/22] | English: | Gaming Machine | [2006/22] | French: | Machine de jeu | [2006/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 02.04.2013 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 01.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/47] | 05.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03025828 (ACRES GAMING INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * page 1, line 6 - line 8 * * page 3, line 19 - line 23 * * page 4, line 4 - line 20 * * page 9, line 25 - page 10, line 1 * * page 17, line 1 - line 9 *; | [X]US6293866 (WALKER JAY S [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 5, line 19 - line 53 *; | [A]US2004158536 (KOWAL DAVID P [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0105] * |