EP1666345 - Crawler traveling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Komatsu Ltd. 2-3-6 Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8414 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Komatsu Ltd 2-3-6 Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8414 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kure, Kazuki c/o Komatsu Ltd. Osaka Plant 3-1-1 Ueno Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-1011 / JP | 02 /
Ibuki, Toshio c/o Komatsu Ltd. Osaka Plant 3-1-1 Ueno Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-1011 / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Teiji c/o Komatsu Ltd. Osaka Plant 3-1-1 Ueno Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-1011 / JP | 04 /
Tamaru, Masatake c/o Komatsu Ltd Research Division 1200 Manda Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8567 / JP | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2006/23] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05257342.5 | 29.11.2005 | [2006/23] | Priority number, date | JP20040348901 | 01.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004348901 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1666345 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1666345 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | [2006/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1666345 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/092 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
B62D55/096 (EP);
B62D55/14 (EP);
B62D55/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/28] |
Former [2006/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Raupenfahrzeug | [2006/23] | English: | Crawler traveling device | [2006/23] | French: | Engin mobile à chenilles | [2006/23] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0808766 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1-5; claim 1 * * column 4, line 15 - line 50 * * column 7, line 19 - column 8, line 25 *; | [A]JP2004299664 ; | [AP]US2005040706 (YAMAMOTO TEIJI [JP], et al) [AP] 1 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0053]; figure 8 *; | [A]DE19640145 (O & K MINING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 6 - line 23 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004299664 A 20041028 (KOMATSU LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH04100973U |