EP1798956 - A method of processing data from a CCD and a CCD imaging apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Perkinelmer Singapore PTE Ltd. 47 Ayer Rajah Crescent, 06-12 Singapore 139947 / SG | [2007/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilkinson Canas, Antonio 32 Thetford Road New Malden Surrey KT3 5DT / GB | 02 /
Hoult, Robert Alan Stable Cottage Finch Lane Knotty Green Beaconsfield Bucks HP9 2TL / GB | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/48] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/25] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane GB-London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05257759.0 | 16.12.2005 | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1798956 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/365, H04N5/217 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
H04N25/625 (EP,US);
H04N25/62 (KR);
H04N25/71 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/25] | H04N5/217, H04N3/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von CCD-Daten und CCD-Bildaufnahmevorrichtung | [2007/25] | English: | A method of processing data from a CCD and a CCD imaging apparatus | [2007/25] | French: | Procédé de traitement de données CCD et dispositif de prise d'images CCD | [2007/25] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/06] | 24.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.11.2012 | 22.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/49] | 16.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.11.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 06.11.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5053615 (PATEL CHANDRAKANT B [US]); | [A]US5198816 (KALINOWSKI JOHN T [US], et al); | [YA]WO2005013605 (E2V TECH UK LTD [GB], et al) | Examination | EP0748113 | US2005117038 | by applicant | EP0748113 | US2005117038 |