EP1683953 - Control apparatus for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miura, Manabu c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Matthew William Nissan Technical Centre Europe Ltd Intellectual Property Department Cranfield Technology Park Bedfordshire, MK43 0DB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | Holmes, Matthew William Nissan Technical Centre Europe Ltd, Intellectual Property Department, Cranfield Technology Park Bedfordshire, MK43 0DB / GB | Application number, filing date | 05257899.4 | 21.12.2005 | [2006/30] | Priority number, date | JP20040370959 | 22.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004370959 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1683953 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1683953 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/08, F02D31/00 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
F02D31/001 (EP,US);
F02D41/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/14] |
Former [2006/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung für einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2006/30] | English: | Control apparatus for an internal combustion engine | [2006/30] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour un moteur à combustion interne | [2006/30] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 11.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0875673 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 3 - column 8, line 15 * * claims 1-3 *; | [A]DE19812305 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]DE19851548 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 3 - column 5, line 20 * * claim 1 * * figure 8 * |