EP1674903 - Optical dry-films and methods of forming optical devices with dry-films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
FR
GB
Rohm and Haas Electronic Materials, LLC 455 Forest Street Marlborough Massachusetts 01752 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | For:DE
FR
GB
Rohm and Haas Electronic Materials, L.L.C. 455 Forest Street Marlborough Massachusetts 01752 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shelnut, James G. 156 Mary Catherine Drive Lancaster Massachusetts 01523 / US | 02 /
Moynihan, Matthew L. 3 Blueberry Lane Sterling Massachusetts 01564 / US | 03 /
Little, Luke W. 113 Kilsyth Road Apt. 2 Brighton Massachusetts 02135 / US | [2006/26] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2006/26] | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd. European Patent Department 4th Floor, 22 Tudor Street London EC4Y 0AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05257941.4 | 21.12.2005 | [2006/26] | Priority number, date | US20040638458P | 22.12.2004 Original published format: US 638458 P | US20050667132P | 31.03.2005 Original published format: US 667132 P | [2006/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1674903 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1674903 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/138 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
G02B6/43 (EP,US);
G02B6/10 (EP,KR,US);
B29D11/00278 (EP,US);
B29D11/0073 (EP,US);
G02B6/138 (EP,US);
H05K1/0274 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/10] |
Former [2006/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optische Trockenfilme und Verfahren zur Herstellung optischer Vorrichtungen mit Trockenfilmen | [2006/26] | English: | Optical dry-films and methods of forming optical devices with dry-films | [2006/26] | French: | Films optiques secs et procédés de formation de dispositifs optiques avec films secs | [2006/26] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 30.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Request for further processing for: | 02.04.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 02.04.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004037866 (SHIPLEY CO LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 7, line 5 - line 16 * * page 15, line 27 - page 16, line 5 * * page 26 - page 28, line 25 *; | [Y]US2003091926 (SHELNUT JAMES G [US]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0009] , [0019] , [0035] , [0036] , [0044] *; | [X]US6511615 (DAWES STEVEN B [US], et al) [X] 7,9 * column 12, line 40 - column 13, line 33; figures 3A-3E,3G-3I * * column 16, line 36 - line 61 * * column 17, line 28 - line 37 * * column 18, line 33 - line 47 *; | [Y]US2003209515 (PAVELCHEK EDWARD K [US]) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0031] , [0037] , [0040] * | Examination | EP1426793 | by applicant | US6731857 | US6842577 | WO03005616 | US6057079 | JPH05158242 | US3954475 | US5366846 | US4442197 | US4603101 | US4624912 | - WAKABAYASHI, BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (1969), vol. 42, pages 2924 - 30 | - JOURNAL OF PHOTOPOLYMER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 4, NO. 3, pages 337 - 340 |