EP1685968 - Platen roller and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [2009/45] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Yoshinori c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Masanori c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | 03 /
Kohira, Hiroyuki c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | 04 /
Obuchi, Tatsuya c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | 05 /
Hoshino, Minoru c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Cloughley, Peter Andrew, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | Cloughley, Peter Andrew, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon, 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 05257974.5 | 22.12.2005 | [2006/31] | Priority number, date | JP20050018351 | 26.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005018351 | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1685968 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1685968 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/32, B65C9/18, B65C9/25, B41J11/057 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
B65C9/183 (EP,US);
B41J11/04 (EP,US);
B41J3/4075 (EP,US);
B65C9/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2007/15] |
Former [2006/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schreibwalze und Verfahren für deren Herstellung | [2006/31] | English: | Platen roller and method of manufacturing the same | [2006/31] | French: | Cylindre d'appui et procédé de su fabrication | [2006/31] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 06.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1963856 (LEWIS ROBERT R, et al) [X] 1* the whole document *; | [X]EP0280241 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0788972 (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 1-21 * page 7, column 39 - page 12, column 52; figures 14-22 *; | [X]US2003117479 (ICHIKAWA AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0114]; figures 8-14 *; | [X]EP1440888 (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 1-21 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0055]; figures 4,5 * | by applicant | JPH10140117 | JPH1179152 | JP2002105414 | JP2002114953 | JP2002114954 | JP2002114955 |