EP1563826 - Process for the preparation of a composition for a cosmetic treatment comprising the extraction under pressure of amino acids, peptides and proteins. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De la Mettrie Roland 6, boulevard d' Angleterre 78110 Le Vesinet / FR | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Casalonga, Axel Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | Casalonga, Axel Bureau D.A. Casalonga - Josse, Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05290114.7 | 19.01.2005 | [2005/33] | Priority number, date | FR20040000846 | 29.01.2004 Original published format: FR 0400846 | [2005/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1563826 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06, A61K7/48 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
A61K8/64 (EP);
A61K8/02 (EP);
A61K8/44 (EP);
A61K8/46 (EP);
A61K8/466 (EP);
A61K8/645 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Zusammensetzung für die kosmetische Behandlung durch Druck-Extraktion von Aminosäuren, Peptiden und Proteinen. | [2005/33] | English: | Process for the preparation of a composition for a cosmetic treatment comprising the extraction under pressure of amino acids, peptides and proteins. | [2005/33] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'une compositon de traitement cosmétique à partir de fluide sous pression, et d'acides aminés, de peptides et de protèines. | [2005/33] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 29.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/16] | 26.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001275619 ; | [X]EP0512470 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [X] 1-16,21-23 * column 1 - column 3 * * claims 1,2 *; | [X]WO03095979 (HEALTH SCIENCES AUTHORITY [SG], et al) [X] 1-16,21-23 * page 3 - page 12 * * example 1 * * claims 1-14 *; | [PX]EP1386602 (OREAL [FR]) [PX] 1-25 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 55 * * column 9, line 34 * * column 9 - column 12 * * claims 1-11 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 10, Database accession no. 2002-069957, XP002297170 & JP2001275619 A 20011009 (JANIFU TECH KK) [X] 1-16 * abstract * |