EP1559654 - Container made of a foldable film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helin, Michel 13, rue Beudant 75017 Paris / FR | [2005/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Casalonga, Axel Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/31] | Casalonga, Axel Bureau D.A. Casalonga - Josse, Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05290124.6 | 20.01.2005 | [2005/31] | Priority number, date | FR20040000957 | 02.02.2004 Original published format: FR 0400957 | [2005/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1559654 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/50 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
B65D5/5033 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Title | German: | Behälter aus einem faltbaren Film | [2005/31] | English: | Container made of a foldable film | [2005/31] | French: | Récipient en matière en feuille pliable | [2005/31] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 28.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/08] | 01.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1439175 (PAPETERIES DE LA HAYE DESCARTE) [A] 1* page 1, column R, line 31 - page 2, column L, line 31; figures 1-6 *; | [A]FR2267255 (LAFARGE EMBALLAGE [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 11 - line 28; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP1057751 (C I F E S P A [IT]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0016] , [0019] , [0023]; figures 1,3 *; | [X]EP1275595 (LINCOLN GLOBAL INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6,10 * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 26 * * column 5, line 47 - line 56; figures 1-11; claims 1-6 * |