EP1560164 - Method and system for the verification of a mailing's height in order to frank it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEOPOST TECHNOLOGIES 113, rue Jean-Marin Naudin 92220 Bagneux / FR | [2006/17] |
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states NEOPOST INDUSTRIE 113 rue Jean-Marin Naudin F-92220 Bagneux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nicolas, Christian Trémolet 26300 Chatuzange Le Goubet / FR | 02 /
Painault, Didier 15 avenue Jules Vercruysse 93170 Bagnolet / FR | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05290146.9 | 24.01.2005 | [2005/31] | Priority number, date | FR20040000934 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: FR 0400934 | [2005/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1560164 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1560164 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
G07B17/00661 (EP,US);
G07B2017/0037 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00685 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/17] |
Former [2005/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überprüfung der Höhe eines Postartikels zwecks Frankierung | [2007/09] | English: | Method and system for the verification of a mailing's height in order to frank it | [2005/31] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de vérification au vol de la hauteur d'un article de courrier à des fins d'affranchissement | [2005/31] |
Former [2005/31] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überprufung der Höhe eines Postartikles zweks frankierung | Examination procedure | 09.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 03.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5535127 (UNO TERUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* column A; figures 9,16 *; | [A]US5808912 (DLUGOS DANIEL F [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column A *; | [XD]EP0871145 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [XD] 1-9 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 51 * * column 4, line 23 - line 27 * * column 5, line 43 - line 50 * * column 5, line 54 - line 58 * * column 6, line 22 - line 28 * * column 11, line 47 - line 56 * * column 12, line 56 - line 58 * * figure 2 *; | [AD]US6169978 (LUTZ BERNHARD [DE], et al) [AD] 1-9 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 2; figure 1 * |