EP1604602 - Suction head of vacuum cleaner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [2014/04] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cho, Seong-Ho Hansin-Cheonggu Apt. 113-408 Mok 6-dong Yangcheon-Gu, Seoul / KR | 02 /
Yoo, Myung-Keun Sambu Apt.102-1106 Singok 2-Dong Uijeongbu Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 03 /
Nam, Young-Sok Hyundai Apt.303-604 484 Gwangjang-Dong Gwangjin-Gu Seoul / KR | [2014/04] |
Former [2005/50] | 01 /
Cho, Seong-Ho Hansin-Cheonggu Apt. 113-408 Mok 6-dong Yangcheon-Gu, Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
Yoo, Myung-Keun Sambu Apt.102-1106 Singok 2-Dong Uijeongbu Gyeonggi-Do / KR | |||
03 /
Nam, Young-Sok Hyundai Apt.303-604 484 Gwangjang-Dong Gwangjin-Gu Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2005/50] | Loisel, Bertrand Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05290287.1 | 09.02.2005 | [2005/50] | Priority number, date | KR20040043306 | 12.06.2004 Original published format: KR 2004043306 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1604602 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1604602 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1604602 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/04 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
A47L9/0411 (EP,US);
A47L9/02 (KR);
A47L9/0483 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/20] |
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Staubsaugersaugkopf | [2005/50] | English: | Suction head of vacuum cleaner | [2005/50] | French: | Tête de suction pour aspirateur | [2005/50] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB344713 (WILLY LEHMANN) [A] 1* page 1, lines 62-90; figure 2 *; | [Y]US4426751 (NORDEEN ERWIN E [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, lines 41-47 - column 4, lines 12-29; figure 3 *; | [Y]US4430768 (NOVINGER HARRY E [US]) [Y] 1-12 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 11; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0553897 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [Y] 11,12 * column 10, line 14 - column 11, line 6 * |