EP1570808 - Stent with markers for a living body conduit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B. Braun Medical SAS 204 Avenue du Maréchal Juin 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2005/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blanloeil, Patrick 14, Allée de Mercure "Chaumont" 86240 Fontaine-le-Comte / FR | 02 /
Forber, Simon 34, rue Théophraste Renaudot 86000 Poitiers / FR | 03 /
Charret, Nathalie, Rés. Le Clos des Coudres Appt. N 7, 14, Rue des Peupliers 86441 Migne-Auxences / FR | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al SCHMIT CHRETIEN 16, Rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al SCHMIT CHRETIEN SCHIHIN 16 rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/12] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al SCHMIT CHRETIEN SCHIHIN SNC 16, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/36] | Arnaud, Jean Lerner et Associés, 5, rue Jules Lefèbvre 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05290397.8 | 22.02.2005 | [2005/36] | Priority number, date | FR20040002215 | 03.03.2004 Original published format: FR 0402215 | [2005/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1570808 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1570808 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
A61F2/915 (EP);
A61F2/91 (EP);
A61B90/39 (EP);
A61F2002/91516 (EP);
A61F2250/0098 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2006/21] |
Former [2005/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stent mit Markierungen für eine Röhre im lebenden Körper | [2005/36] | English: | Stent with markers for a living body conduit | [2005/36] | French: | Endoprothèse à marqueurs pour conduit d'un corps vivant | [2005/36] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 23.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6334871 (DOR OFER [IL], et al) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * figure 11 *; | [DA]US2002103528 (SCHALDACH MAX [DE], et al) [DA] 8 * the whole document *; | [DA]US2002143386 (DAVILA LUIS A [US], et al) [DA] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03061502 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,8* page 2, line 25 - line 26 *; | [A]EP1362564 (CORDIS NEUROVASCULAR INC [US]) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0019] * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2004015228 (LOMBARDI SYLVIE [DE], et al) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0011] * |