EP1575240 - Device and method for a treatment of frames with multiprotocol usage field for a communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ciavaglia, Laurent 29 rue du Château 77300 Fontainebleau / FR | 02 /
Dotaro, Emmanuel 14, Résidence du Clos 91370 Verrières le Buisson / FR | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Korakis-Ménager, Sophie, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54, Rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | Korakis-Ménager, Sophie, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/37] | Fournier, Michel Robert Marie, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Département Propriété Industrielle 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05290491.9 | 04.03.2005 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | FR20040050472 | 09.03.2004 Original published format: FR 0450472 | [2005/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1575240 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1575240 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/46 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
H04L12/4633 (EP,US);
H04L69/03 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L69/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bearbeitung von Rahmen mit multiprotokollverwendungsfeldern für ein Kommunikationsnetzwerk | [2007/01] | English: | Device and method for a treatment of frames with multiprotocol usage field for a communication network | [2005/37] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de traitement de trames à champ à utilisation multiprotocolaire, pour un réseau de communications | [2005/37] |
Former [2005/37] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bearbeitung von Rahmen mit multiprotokollverwendungsfelder für ein Kommunikationsnetzwerk | Examination procedure | 02.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 23.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07102262.8 / EP1780980 | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.04.2008 | CY | 16.04.2008 | CZ | 16.04.2008 | DK | 16.04.2008 | EE | 16.04.2008 | FI | 16.04.2008 | IE | 16.04.2008 | LT | 16.04.2008 | PL | 16.04.2008 | RO | 16.04.2008 | SI | 16.04.2008 | SK | 16.04.2008 | TR | 16.04.2008 | BG | 16.07.2008 | SE | 16.07.2008 | GR | 17.07.2008 | IS | 16.08.2008 | PT | 16.09.2008 | HU | 17.10.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
GR | 17.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
HU | 17.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
GR | 17.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 16.04.2008 | |
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 16.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002167898 (THANG PHI CAM [CA], et al) [A] 1-18* paragraph [0201] *; | [X] - J. REYNOLDS ET AL., "RFC 1700: Assigned Numbers", IETF RFC PUBLICATION, PAGES 1, 16, 54, 168-171, 176-178, INTERNET, (199410), URL: ftp://ftp.isi.edu/in-notes/rfc1700.txt, (20041020), XP002302087 [X] 1-18 * page 168 * * page 168, line 17 * * page 170, line 16 * | [A] - E. ROSEN ET AL., "RFC 3031: Multiprotocol Label Switching Architecture (MPLS)", RFC-PUBLICATION, INTERNET, (200101), pages 1 - 11, URL: ftp://ftp.isi.edu/in-notes/rfc3031.txt, (20041020), XP002302088 [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [03.3] - [03.4] * |