EP1577508 - Valve return device motor provided with such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERTECHNIQUE 61, rue Pierre Curie F-78370 Plaisir / FR | [2005/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martinez, Patrice 14 rue du Pont Marquant 78610 Le Perray En Yvelines / FR | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Louiset, Raphaël Cabinet Plasseraud 52 Rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Louiset, Raphael Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire F-75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05290548.6 | 11.03.2005 | [2005/38] | Priority number, date | FR20040002764 | 17.03.2004 Original published format: FR 0402764 | [2005/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1577508 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1577508 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/46, F01L1/12 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
F01L1/465 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2006/24] |
Former [2005/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ventilrückholvorrichtung und Motor mit solcher Vorrichtung | [2005/38] | English: | Valve return device motor provided with such a device | [2005/38] | French: | Dispositif de rappel d'une soupape et moteur équipé d'un tel dispositif | [2005/38] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 22.03.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.07.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.04.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2342003 (MEYER FRED C) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-10 * * page 1, column 2, line 40 - line 55 *; | [A]EP1132581 (SAGEM [FR]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2 * * abstract * * column 4, line 29 - line 44 *; | [A]DE4220689 (MAN B & W DIESEL GMBH [DK]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-4 * * abstract * * column 4, line 22 - line 63 *; | [A]DE3808542 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2 * * abstract * * column 5, line 22 - line 33 *; | [A]US5664527 (BOUDY JEAN-PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * * abstract * |