EP1591514 - USE OF ADDITIVES TO IMPROVE THE ODOR OF HYDROCARBON COMPOSITIONS AND HYDROCARBON COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING SUCH ADDITIVES. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/44] | Use of additives to improve the odor of hydrocarbon compositions and hydrocarbon compositions comprising such additives. | ||
[2018/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTAL MARKETING SERVICES 24, Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [2018/23] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states TOTAL MARKETING SERVICES 24, Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states TOTAL RAFFINAGE MARKETING 24 cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Total France 24, Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Germanaud, Laurent Route de LaFayette Valenein 38540 Meyrieux / FR | 02 /
Eydoux, Franck 80, rue Crémière Le Planil 69440 Saint-Laurent-d'Agny / FR | 03 /
Doucet, Clarisse 25, boulevard de la Croix Rousse 69004 Lyon / FR | 04 /
Fadel, Denis 180, rue de Fontfamineuse 38670 Chesse/Rhone / FR | 05 /
Chambon, Cécile 18, avenue de Verdun 69630 Chaponost / FR | 06 /
Trémolière, Christian 19, avenue François Goby 06460 Saint-Vallier-de-Thiey / FR | 07 /
Mercier, Jean-Paul 5ter, rue Caillou-Mérard 78400 Chatou / FR | [2018/23] |
Former [2005/44] | 01 /
Germanaud, Laurent Route de LaFayette Valenein 38540 Meyrieux / FR | ||
02 /
Eydoux, Franck 80, rue Crémière Le Planil 69440 Saint-Laurent-d'Agny / FR | |||
03 /
Doucet, Clarisse 25, boulevard de la Croix Rousse 69004 Lyon / FR | |||
04 /
Fadel, Denis 180, rue de Fontfamineuse 38670 Chesse/Rhone / FR | |||
05 /
Chambon, Cécile 18, avenue de Verdun 69630 Chaponost / FR | |||
06 /
Trémolière, Christian 19, avenue François Goby 06460 Saint-Vallier-de-Thiey / FR | |||
07 /
Mercier, Jean-Paul 5ter, rue Caillou-Mérard 78400 Chatou / FR | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2018/23] |
Former [2005/44] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05290917.3 | 26.04.2005 | [2005/44] | Priority number, date | FR20040004654 | 30.04.2004 Original published format: FR 0404654 | [2005/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1591514 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1591514 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1591514 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/16, C10L1/18, C10L1/14 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
C10L1/1608 (EP);
C10L1/143 (EP);
C10L1/1852 (EP);
C10L1/1857 (EP);
C10L1/19 (EP);
C10L1/191 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/23] |
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON ADDITIVEN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES GERUCHS VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, UND SOLCHE ADDITIVE ENTHALTENDE KOHLENWASSERSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN. | [2018/04] | English: | USE OF ADDITIVES TO IMPROVE THE ODOR OF HYDROCARBON COMPOSITIONS AND HYDROCARBON COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING SUCH ADDITIVES. | [2018/04] | French: | UTILISATION D'ADDITIFS POUR AMÉLIORER L'ODEUR DE COMPOSITIONS D'HYDROCARBURES ET COMPOSITIONS D'HYDROCARBURES COMPRENANT DE TELS ADDITIFS | [2018/04] |
Former [2005/44] | Verwendung von Additiven zur Verbesserung des Geruchs von Kohlenwasserstoffzusammensetzungen, und solche Additive enthaltende Kohlenwasserstoffzusammensetzungen. | ||
Former [2005/44] | Use of additives to improve the odor of hydrocarbon compositions and hydrocarbon compositions comprising such additives. | ||
Former [2005/44] | Utilisation d'additifs pour améliorer l'odeur de compositions d'hydrocarbures et compositions d'hydrocarbures comprenant de tels additifs | Examination procedure | 09.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 14.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2005 | AT | 06.06.2018 | CY | 06.06.2018 | DK | 06.06.2018 | EE | 06.06.2018 | ES | 06.06.2018 | FI | 06.06.2018 | IT | 06.06.2018 | LT | 06.06.2018 | MC | 06.06.2018 | NL | 06.06.2018 | RO | 06.06.2018 | SE | 06.06.2018 | SI | 06.06.2018 | SK | 06.06.2018 | BG | 06.09.2018 | GR | 07.09.2018 | IS | 06.10.2018 | PT | 08.10.2018 | [2021/32] |
Former [2020/29] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1405551 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO) [A] 1,10-14,18,19 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1426100 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO) [A] 1,11-14,18,19 * page 2; claim 11 *; | [XY]US3453329 (ALTWICKER ELMAR R) [X] 1-6,9-14 * example VII; claims 1,2 * * column 4, line 7 - line 12 * [Y] 18,19; | [A]US3598745 (DUNKEL MORRIS) [A] 15,16 * example 6; claim 1 *; | [A]DE2304068 (BASF AG) [A] 1,9,10* column 2, line 12 - line 32 *; | [A]EP0201726 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [A] 1-5,9,21,23 * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 17; claims 1-3,6,7 * * page 7, line 1 - line 6 * * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 10 *; | [DY]WO9118961 (EXXON CHEMICAL LTD [GB], et al) [DY] 7,8,20,22 * page 2, paragraph 3; claims 1-20 * * page 4, line 1 - page 7, line 21 * [Y] 18,19; | [A]EP0505801 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-5,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9525153 (OLAH GEORGE A [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 21; claims 1-20 *; | [XY]FR2811675 (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 15-17 * page 3, line 12 - line 22; example 1; claims 1-5,7,11 * * page 3, line 33 * * page 4, line 5 - line 6 * [Y] 7,8,20,22; | [A]US2003051393 (STICKNEY MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 21,23 * paragraphs [0068] , [0091] *; | [A]WO03070871 (DRAGOCO GERBERDING CO AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-8,15,16,20,22 * claims 1,2 * |