EP1607673 - Method of manufacturing an element of a multiple walled pipe of circular cross section for heating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PARTICIPATION GESTION DEVELOPPEMENT INDUSTRIEL - P.G.D.I.-S.A. 2, rue de la Cerisaie Z.I. Rennes Nord 35760 Saint-Grégoire / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states Participation Gestion Développement Industriel - P.G.D.I.-S.A. 2, rue de la Cerisaie, Z.I. Rennes Nord 35760 Saint-Grégoire / FR | ||
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Participation Gestion Développement Industriel - P.G.D.I.-S.A. 2, rue de la Cerisaie, Z.I. Rennes Nord 35760 Saint-Grégoire / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Joncoux, Jacques-Olivier 18, rue Michelet 35700 Rennes / FR | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Maillet, Alain Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 5, place Newquay B.P. 70250 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Maillet, Alain Cabinet le Guen & Maillet, 5, Place Newquay, B.P. 70250 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05291084.1 | 19.05.2005 | [2005/51] | Priority number, date | FR20040006606 | 17.06.2004 Original published format: FR 0406606 | [2005/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1607673 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1607673 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16L39/00 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
F16L39/005 (EP);
F16L7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren einer mehrwandigen Rohrleitung mit kreisförmigem Querschnitt für Heizgeräte | [2005/51] | English: | Method of manufacturing an element of a multiple walled pipe of circular cross section for heating device | [2005/51] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un élément de conduit multi parois de section circulaire pour appareil de chauffage | [2005/51] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.04.2008 | CY | 02.04.2008 | CZ | 02.04.2008 | DK | 02.04.2008 | EE | 02.04.2008 | FI | 02.04.2008 | IE | 02.04.2008 | IT | 02.04.2008 | LT | 02.04.2008 | RO | 02.04.2008 | SI | 02.04.2008 | SK | 02.04.2008 | TR | 02.04.2008 | LU | 19.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | BG | 02.07.2008 | SE | 02.07.2008 | IS | 02.08.2008 | PT | 03.09.2008 | HU | 03.10.2008 | [2010/39] |
Former [2010/33] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
IT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
LU | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
IT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 02.04.2008 | |
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 02.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2693026 (SIMPELAAR CLYDE S) [Y] 3,5 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 69; figures 1-5 *; | [XA]US4607665 (WILLIAMS SAMUEL B [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 53; figures 3,6,7 *[A] 5; | [XY]EP0553936 (COX GEELEN BV [NL]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 46; figures 1-3,7,8 * [Y] 3,5; | [YA]EP1116917 (POMEL ETS [FR]) [Y] 6 * figures 1,2,5 * [A] 4; | [XY]EP1428590 (PARTICIPATION GESTION DEV IND [FR]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0036]; figure unique * [Y] 6 |