EP1602682 - Dispersion, production method thereof and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | [2005/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamoto, Keiichi 5-1-204, Nishimachi Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-0854 / JP | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Hart Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05291157.5 | 30.05.2005 | [2005/49] | Priority number, date | JP20040162088 | 31.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004162088 | JP20050026212 | 02.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005026212 | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1602682 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/00, C08F265/06 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
C08J3/00 (EP,US);
C08J3/03 (KR);
C08F265/06 (EP,US);
C08J3/12 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08F265/06, C08F2/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [2006/33] |
Former [2005/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dispersion, Herstellungsverfahren und deren Verwendung | [2005/50] | English: | Dispersion, production method thereof and use thereof | [2005/49] | French: | Dispersion, son procédé de préparation et son utilisation. | [2005/50] |
Former [2005/49] | Dispersion, Herstellungsverfahren und Verwendung | ||
Former [2005/49] | Dispersion, son procédé de préparation et son utilisation | Examination procedure | 27.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 07.06.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.10.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.07.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5081166 (KIEHLBAUCH RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1-10* example 1 *; | [A]US5744540 (BAUMSTARK ROLAND [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 11, line 54 - column 12, line 11 * * column 9, lines 29-50 * * claims 1,28,41 * |