EP1639988 - Cosmetic solid W/O emulsion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states L'ORÉAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Themens, Agnès 3, Clos St. Jacques 92340 Bourg la Reine / FR | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Boulard, Denis L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Boulard, Denis L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | Application number, filing date | 05291366.2 | 24.06.2005 | [2006/13] | Priority number, date | FR20040051550 | 16.07.2004 Original published format: FR 0451550 | FR20040051548 | 16.07.2004 Original published format: FR 0451548 | [2006/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1639988 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1639988 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | [2006/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1639988 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/04, A61K8/92, A61K8/896, A61Q1/00, A61Q1/02, A61Q1/06, A61Q1/08, A61Q1/10 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
A61K8/894 (EP);
A61K8/06 (EP);
A61K8/064 (EP);
A61K8/37 (EP);
A61K8/92 (EP);
A61Q1/02 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/13] | A61K8/04, A61K8/92, A61K8/896, A61Q1/00, A61Q1/02, A61Q1/06, A61Q1/08, A61Q1/10, A61Q15/00, A61Q19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Title | German: | Kosmetische feste W/Ö Emulsion | [2006/13] | English: | Cosmetic solid W/O emulsion | [2006/13] | French: | Emulsion cosmétique eau-dans-huile solide | [2006/13] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 16.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.2010
ADMISSIBLE KPSS-Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH Pfungstädter Str. 92-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE Opponent's representative Grit, Mustafa, et al, et al KPSS - Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH Pfungstädterstraße 92-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.2010
ADMISSIBLE KPSS-Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH Pfungstädter Str. 92-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE Opponent's representative Grit, Mustafa, et al, et al KPSS - Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH Pfungstädterstraße 92-100 D-64297 Darmstadt / DE | 26.04.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.11.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 27.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.06.2009 | CY | 17.06.2009 | CZ | 17.06.2009 | DK | 17.06.2009 | EE | 17.06.2009 | FI | 17.06.2009 | IE | 17.06.2009 | LT | 17.06.2009 | NL | 17.06.2009 | PL | 17.06.2009 | RO | 17.06.2009 | SI | 17.06.2009 | SK | 17.06.2009 | TR | 17.06.2009 | LU | 24.06.2009 | BE | 30.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | BG | 17.09.2009 | SE | 17.09.2009 | GR | 18.09.2009 | IS | 17.10.2009 | PT | 17.10.2009 | HU | 18.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
LU | 24.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
HU | 18.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
LU | 24.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | LT | 17.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0570337 ; | [A]JP2000351712 ; | [X]WO9947111 (OREAL [FR], et al) [X] 3-55 * page 7, lines 18-39; examples 1,3a,3b; claim 23 *; | [X]EP1036553 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 3-55 * example 5; claim 1 *; | [X]EP1068852 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 3-55 * examples 1,2; claim 1 *; | [X]WO03000223 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 3-55 * examples 1-5; claim 1 *; | [X]WO03028690 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE], et al) [X] 3-55 * page 22, paragraph 5; claims 1,2 *; | [X]DE10162841 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 3-55 * examples 10.1-7 *; | [A]EP1416016 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1,2,4-55 * examples 25,30; claim 6 *; | [PX]EP1473017 (OREAL [FR]) [PX] 3-55 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [PX]EP1481660 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PX] 1,2,4-55 * example 55 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930722), vol. 017, no. 391, Database accession no. (C - 1087), & JP05070337 A 19930323 (KOSE CORP) [X] 3-55 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010406), vol. 2000, no. 15, & JP2000351712 A 20001219 (KOSE CORP) [A] 3-55 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2425848 | EP1086683 | EP1213316 | WO2004024798 |