EP1612443 - Clutch release bearing and process for manufacturing the same. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF Hornsgatan 1 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bussit, Sylvain 59 Allée des Vergers d'antan 37100 Tours / FR | 02 /
Caillault, Claude 5 Rue Léon Joulin 37000 Tours / FR | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Casalonga, Axel Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/01] | Casalonga, Axel Bureau D.A. Casalonga-Josse Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 05291407.4 | 30.06.2005 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | FR20040007390 | 02.07.2004 Original published format: FR 0407390 | [2006/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1612443 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1612443 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16D25/08 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
F16D25/083 (EP,US);
F16D23/14 (EP,US);
F16D2250/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/36] |
Former [2006/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kupplungsausrücklager und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung. | [2006/01] | English: | Clutch release bearing and process for manufacturing the same. | [2006/01] | French: | Butée de débrayage et procédé de fabrication | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 01.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 14.02.2007 | [2007/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0452515 (FEDERAL MOGUL CORP [US]) [A] 1,8-10 * abstract ** column 14, line 34 - line 38 *; | [A]EP0964191 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD USA [US]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]US6035990 (PESCHKE HARALD [DE]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2668560 | FR2772444 |