EP1628237 - Information processing system, information processing device, and program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sukigara, Ryu, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-Chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Koresawa, Akio, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-Chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ohshige, Yoichi, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-Chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Takeda, Takashi, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-Chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/08] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05291472.8 | 07.07.2005 | [2006/08] | Priority number, date | JP20040206337 | 13.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004206337 | [2006/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1628237 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1628237 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/20 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
H04L63/10 (EP,US);
G06F21/33 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
H04L63/0876 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2117 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2129 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/08] | G06F21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/28] |
Former [2006/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungssystem, Informationsverarbeitungsvorrichtung und -programm | [2006/08] | English: | Information processing system, information processing device, and program | [2006/08] | French: | Système de traitement d'information, dispositif et programme de traitement d'information | [2006/08] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 18.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/17] | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/17] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 15.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5684951 (GOLDMAN JONATHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 3A,6,8,9 * * column 5, line 34 - column 8, line 29 ** column 8, line 42 - column 10, line 67 *; | [A]US6006334 (NGUYEN BINH Q [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-7,12 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 2 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 40 *; | [X]WO0190859 (NETSCAPE COMM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,12 * page 2, line 11 - line 36 * * page 3, line 25 - line 31 * * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 28 *; | [Y]EP1361723 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [Y] 4,11 * figures 2,4A,4B,5 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0085] *; | [A]US2003229782 (BIBLE ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-10,12 * figures 2,3A * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] *; | [XY]US2004006710 (POLLUTRO DENNIS VANCE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10,12 * figures 5,6 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0065] * [Y] 4,11 | by applicant | WO0230054 |