EP1750147 - Metal detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manneschi, Alessandro 15 Via XXV Aprile 52100 Arezzo / IT | For all designated states Manneschi, Giovanni Via XXV Aprile 17 52100 Arezzo / IT | [2007/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/06] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2007/06] | Texier, Christian, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05291666.5 | 04.08.2005 | [2007/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1750147 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1750147 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
G01V3/104 (EP,US);
G01T1/167 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/06] | G01V3/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/41] |
Former [2007/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Metalldetektor | [2007/06] | English: | Metal detector | [2007/06] | French: | Détecteur de métaux | [2007/06] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 16.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2007 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2608286 (MANNESCHI ALESSANDRO [IT]); | [A]US4866424 (PARKS STEPHEN I [US]); | [A]FR2698968 (MANNESCHI ALESSANDRO [IT]); | [A]US5397986 (CONWAY GRANVILLE T [US], et al); | [XA]US5406259 (MANNESCHI GIOVANNI [IT]); | [A]US5680103 (TURNER JOHN EDWARD [US], et al); | [A]EP0831339 (VALLON GMBH [DE]); | [A]US5859532 (KELLER HELMUT [DE]); | [A]US5992094 (DIAZ WILLIAM [US]); | [A]EP1219976 (BANGSAN TECHNOLOGIES INC [KR], et al); | [XA]WO03069320 (RANGER SECURITY DETECTORS INC [US]); | [A]US2004140798 (MANNESCHI ALESSANDRO [IT]) | by applicant | IT72791 | US3707672 | US3971983 | US4012690 | US4019053 | US4263551 | US4449115 | FR2607937 | FR2608286 | FR2610417 | WO8807733 | US4866439 | US4866424 | IT1214991 | US4987767 | WO9103746 | US5039981 | US5073782 | US5109691 | US5121105 | EP0490921 | US5227800 | FR2694098 | FR2697919 | FR2698178 | FR2698968 | US5341126 | FR2720519 | EP0740822 | US5600303 | US5680103 | WO9742527 | US5689184 | US5692029 | WO9750000 | US5726628 | WO9812573 | US5790685 | FR2775350 | FR2780585 | US6133829 | US6150810 | US6218830 | US2001042412 | US6342696 | US6344818 | US6359582 | US6362739 | US2002130804 | US6507309 | US6507278 | WO03032011 | US2003128150 | US2003142853 |