EP1759954 - Method and system for monitoring a public transport vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trautwein, Wolfgang Hirschbergstr. 27 71634 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | Brose, Gerhard, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Brose, Gerhard, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department 70430 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05291822.4 | 01.09.2005 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1759954 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1759954 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B61L3/12, B61L15/00, H04N7/18 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
H04N7/181 (EP);
B61L15/0027 (EP);
B61L15/009 (EP);
B61L23/00 (EP);
B61L23/041 (EP);
B61L3/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Überwachen eines Fahrzeugs für den öffentlichen Personenverkehrs | [2007/10] | English: | Method and system for monitoring a public transport vehicle | [2007/10] | French: | Procédé et système pour surveiller des véhicules de transport en commun | [2007/10] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2006 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 23.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.02.2008 | BE | 27.02.2008 | CY | 27.02.2008 | CZ | 27.02.2008 | DK | 27.02.2008 | EE | 27.02.2008 | FI | 27.02.2008 | IT | 27.02.2008 | LT | 27.02.2008 | LV | 27.02.2008 | NL | 27.02.2008 | PL | 27.02.2008 | RO | 27.02.2008 | SI | 27.02.2008 | SK | 27.02.2008 | TR | 27.02.2008 | BG | 27.05.2008 | SE | 27.05.2008 | GR | 28.05.2008 | ES | 07.06.2008 | IS | 27.06.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | HU | 28.08.2008 | IE | 01.09.2008 | LU | 01.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/39] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
TR | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
HU | 28.08.2008 | ||
IE | 01.09.2008 | ||
LU | 01.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
IE | 01.09.2008 | ||
LU | 01.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
IE | 01.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 27.02.2008 | |
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1252093 (LABORATOIRE GENERAL DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS) [A] 1,9 * page 1, line 58 - page 1, line 80 * * figure . *; | [XA]EP0560314 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) [X] 1-4,9 * column 2, line 40 - line 58 * * column 4, line 18 - line 55 * * column 6, line 1 - line 51 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 5-8,10,11; | [DA]WO9400953 (TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS & MARKE [GB], et al) [DA] 1,6,7,9-11 * page 2, line 4 - page 2, line 16 * * page 3, line 4 - page 5, line 10 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1157913 (ISRAEL AIRCRAFT IND LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1,9 * paragraphs [0028] - [0032] ** figures 1a,1b,3 *; | [A]US2001050709 (SAMEJIMA AKITAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0050] - [0076] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2002135471 (CORBITT TIMOTHY W [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] * * paragraphs [0028] - [0035] * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]DE10209210 (GSP SPRACHTECHNOLOGIE GES FUER [DE]) [A] 1,9 * paragraphs [0012] - [0017] *; | [A]GB2392983 (BOMBARDIER TRANSP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9 * page 31, line 4 - page 35, line 21 * * figure 23 *; | [XA]WO2005058668 (KIM JOUNG-MOO [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,9 * page 23, line 4 - page 24, line 17 * * page 30, line 4 - page 32, line 4 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 5-8,10,11; | [A] - LIANG X ET AL, "Mobile internet access for high-speed trains via heterogeneous networks", PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, 2003. PIMRC 2003. 14TH IEEE PROCEEDINGS ON SEPT. 7-10, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030907), ISBN 0-7803-7822-9, pages 177 - 181, XP010681580 [A] 1,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PIMRC.2003.1264256 | by applicant | WO9400953 |