EP1637417 - Wiper motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsuba Corporation 2681, 1-chome Hirosawacho, Kiryu-shi Gunma-ken / JP | [2006/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bendo, Keiichi c/o Mitsuba Corporation 2681, Hirosawacho 1-chome Kiryu-shi Gunma / JP | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Plaçais, Jean Yves Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Plaçais, Jean Yves Cabinet Netter, 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05291931.3 | 19.09.2005 | [2006/12] | Priority number, date | JP20040274112 | 21.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004274112 | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1637417 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1637417 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1637417 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/16, H02K7/116 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
B60S1/166 (EP,KR,US);
H02K1/28 (KR);
H02K7/116 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/25] |
Former [2006/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wischermotor | [2006/12] | English: | Wiper motor | [2006/12] | French: | Moteur d'essuie-glace | [2006/12] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5855140 (IMAMURA TAKAYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-13 * column 6, line 42 - column 11, line 39; figure - * * column 13, line 7 - line 38 *; | [A]DE3247421 (RAU SWF AUTOZUBEHOER [DE]) [A] 1-13 * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 3 *; | [A]US5566577 (KLAR JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1-13 * column 4, line 6 - column 6, line 22; figure - *; | [A]US5990586 (MILANO JR ARTHUR J [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 5; figure - * | by applicant | JP2000341906 |