EP1647303 - Implantable active medical system with telemetric RF-circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, LU, TR | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELA MEDICAL 98, rue Maurice Arnoux 92541 Montrouge / FR | [2006/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dal Molin, Renzo 7 Allée Mozart 92320 Châtillon / FR | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Bardehle Pagenberg SPE SAS SO Square Opéra 5, rue Boudreau 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al SEP Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler 14 boulevard Malesherbes 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05292097.2 | 10.10.2005 | [2006/16] | Priority number, date | FR20040010742 | 12.10.2004 Original published format: FR 0410742 | [2006/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1647303 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1647303 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/378 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
A61N1/37223 (EP,US);
A61N1/378 (EP,US);
Y10S323/911 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Title | German: | Implantierbare aktive medizinische vorrichtung mit telemetrischem RF-Schaltkreis | [2006/16] | English: | Implantable active medical system with telemetric RF-circuit | [2006/16] | French: | Dispositf médical implantable actif comprenant un circuit de télémétrie RF | [2006/16] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 18.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.2007 | CY | 02.05.2007 | CZ | 02.05.2007 | DK | 02.05.2007 | EE | 02.05.2007 | FI | 02.05.2007 | LT | 02.05.2007 | LV | 02.05.2007 | NL | 02.05.2007 | PL | 02.05.2007 | RO | 02.05.2007 | SI | 02.05.2007 | SK | 02.05.2007 | TR | 02.05.2007 | BG | 02.08.2007 | GR | 03.08.2007 | ES | 13.08.2007 | IS | 02.09.2007 | PT | 02.10.2007 | LU | 10.10.2007 | BE | 31.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | HU | 03.11.2007 | [2009/45] |
Former [2009/11] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
EE | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LV | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
PL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
IS | 02.09.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LV | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
PL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
IS | 02.09.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LV | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
PL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
IS | 02.09.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LV | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
PL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
IS | 02.09.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LV | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
PL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
IS | 02.09.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LV | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
PL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
IS | 02.09.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LV | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
PL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
IS | 02.09.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
PL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
IS | 02.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
PL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
IS | 02.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/52] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
PL | 02.05.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
IS | 02.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5807397 (BARRERAS FRANCISCO J [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP1062983 (BIOTRONIK MESS & THERAPIEG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0011] *; | [A]US2002068957 (WOLFE JAMES H [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0042]; figures 1a,1c,3a *; | [A]US6426628 (PALM WILLIAM A [US], et al) [A] 1-10* abstract * |