EP1775306 - ckrox peptides and analogs thereof for treating skin ageing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/16] | cKrox peptides and analogs thereof for treating skin ageing | ||
[2008/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Consumer France SAS 1, rue Camille Desmoulins 92787 Issy les Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oddos, Thierry 9, rue du professeur 92190 Meudon / FR | 02 /
Bellemere, Gaëlle APPT 93 7, Rue Berlioz 76000 Rouen / FR | [2009/15] |
Former [2007/16] | 01 /
Oddos, Thierry 9, rue du professeur 92190 Meudon / FR | ||
02 /
Bellemere, Gaelle APPT 93 7, Rue Berlioz 76000 Rouen / FR | Representative(s) | Metten, Karl-Heinz, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Metten, Karl-Heinz, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05292121.0 | 11.10.2005 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1775306 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1775306 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, A61K38/08 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
C07K14/4702 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
C07K7/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Title | German: | ckrox-Peptide und ihre Analoge zur Behandlung von Hautalterung | [2007/16] | English: | ckrox peptides and analogs thereof for treating skin ageing | [2008/49] | French: | Peptides de ckrox et leurs analogues pour le traitement du vieillissement cutane | [2007/16] |
Former [2007/16] | cKrox peptides and analogs thereof for treating skin ageing | Examination procedure | 17.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 20.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.04.2009 | BE | 08.04.2009 | CY | 08.04.2009 | CZ | 08.04.2009 | DK | 08.04.2009 | EE | 08.04.2009 | FI | 08.04.2009 | IT | 08.04.2009 | LT | 08.04.2009 | LV | 08.04.2009 | NL | 08.04.2009 | PL | 08.04.2009 | RO | 08.04.2009 | SI | 08.04.2009 | SK | 08.04.2009 | TR | 08.04.2009 | BG | 08.07.2009 | SE | 08.07.2009 | GR | 09.07.2009 | ES | 19.07.2009 | IS | 08.08.2009 | PT | 08.09.2009 | HU | 09.10.2009 | IE | 11.10.2009 | LU | 11.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
HU | 09.10.2009 | ||
IE | 11.10.2009 | ||
LU | 11.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
IE | 11.10.2009 | ||
LU | 11.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
IE | 11.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
IE | 11.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | LT | 08.04.2009 | |
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | SI | 08.04.2009 | |
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | SI | 08.04.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005065090 (LUDIN CHRISTIAN [CH], et al); | [X] - TAMURA T ET AL, "ANTIBODIES AGAINST SYNTHETIC PEPTIDES AS A TOOL FOR FUNCTIONAL ANALYSIS OF THE TRANSFORMING PROTEIN PP-60-SRC", CELL, (1983), vol. 34, no. 2, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 587 - 596, XP002367811 [X] 1,2,8,9 * Table 1, peptide KKGERL (A4-A9). * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(83)90391-4 | [X] - "Homo sapiens Ig gene V segment, D segment, and J segment.", EMBL, (19951001), Database accession no. L37848, URL: EBI, XP002367817 [X] 1,2,8,9 * Peptide TKG * | [X] - "transthyretin [human, Genomic Mutant, 9 nt].", EMBL, (19931124), Database accession no. S60148, URL: EBI, XP002367818 [X] 1,2,8,9 * Peptide TRG * | [X] - "Chlamydomonas reinhardtii strain CC-2290 AC206 (AC206) gene, 3' UTR and partial cds.", EMBL, (20040218), Database accession no. AY453426, URL: EBI, XP002367819 [X] 1,2,8,9 * Peptide AKQ * | [X] - "Homo sapiens Ig gene V segment, D segment, and J segment.", EMBL, (19951001), Database accession no. L37861, URL: EBI, XP002367820 [X] 1,2,8,9 * Peptide ARG * | [AD] - GALERA PHILIPPE ET AL, "C-Krox, a transcriptional regulator of type I collagen gene expression, is preferentially expressed in skin", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (1994), vol. 91, no. 20, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 9372 - 9376, XP002367812 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.20.9372 | by applicant | US2005065090 |