EP1777848 - Digital device and method for recording broadcast information received during a call [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-875 / KR | [2007/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Chul Soo 103-95, Sillim 2(i)-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul / KR | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2007/17] | Loisel, Bertrand Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05292506.2 | 25.11.2005 | [2007/17] | Priority number, date | KR20050099400 | 20.10.2005 Original published format: KR 2005099400 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1777848 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1777848 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
H04H60/27 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/06 (KR);
H04N5/44 (KR);
H04M1/72403 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/17] | Title | German: | Digitales Gerät und Verfahren zum Aufzeichnen von empfangenen Rundfunkdaten während eines Anrufes | [2007/17] | English: | Digital device and method for recording broadcast information received during a call | [2007/17] | French: | Appareil digital et procédé pour enrégistrer des informations de radiodiffusion reçues pendant un appel | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/18] | 30.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/18] | 16.12.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0203683 (DISCOVERY COMMUNICAT INC [US]) [A] 1-47 * page 26, lines 15-23 * * page 64, lines 5-17 ** page 78, line 4 - page 87, line 20; figures 24,28,29,32 *; | [X]US2003097659 (GOLDMAN PHILLIP Y [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0047] - [0052]; figure 3 *; | [X]US2004204020 (KURAMITSU MAMI [JP]) [X] 1-47 * paragraphs [0007] - [0019] - [0054] , [0063] , [0064] , [0079] , [0092] - [0099] - [0107] , [0118]; figures 2,5,8,10,17,20,23,26 * |