EP1666013 - Variable geometry stretcher which is helicopter liftable, floatable, in particular for the recovery of persons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daouk, Antar 27, avenue du Maréchal Lyautey F-75016 Paris / FR | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/23] | Application number, filing date | 05292569.0 | 05.12.2005 | [2006/23] | Priority number, date | FR20040012953 | 06.12.2004 Original published format: FR 0412953 | [2006/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1666013 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61G1/00 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
A61G1/00 (EP);
A61G2220/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/07] |
Former [2006/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verstellbare, schwimmfähige und mit einem Hubschrauber bergbare Krankentrage | [2006/23] | English: | Variable geometry stretcher which is helicopter liftable, floatable, in particular for the recovery of persons | [2006/23] | French: | Civière à géométrie variable, hélitreuillable, flottante, destinée notamment à la récupération de personnes | [2006/23] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/10] | 17.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4087030 (KNIGHT WILLIAM E) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 27; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0630805 (DAOUK ANTAR [FR]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]FR810285 (VEPER) [A] 1-3 * page 1, line 50 - page 2, line 52; figures 1,2,10 *; | [A]US3609778 (ZEINER EUGENE A) [A] 1,5,7 * abstract *; | [A]US5829078 (RIVERS GREGORY W [CA]) [A] 1,5,7 * abstract *; | [A]GB1473862 (COAL IND LD) [A] 1 * page 1, line 13 - line 20; figure - * | by applicant | FR2836962 | EP1342662 | FR2827159 | EP1433451 |