EP1668997 - Male undergarment with protective pouch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DELTA GALIL INDUSTRIES LTD. 2 Koyfmann Street 68012 Tel Aviv / IL | [2006/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stankowski, Alona 1/13 Hadasim Street Upper Nazareth 17542 / IL | 02 /
Basson Yemini, Iris 3 Zalman Shazar Street 45372 Hod Hasharon / IL | 03 /
Emanuel, Eliyahu 59/C Ramin Street Carmiel 21861 / IL | 04 /
Yaacov, Ayelet Moshav Kfar Haim, 42945 / IL | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Bérogin, Francis Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Bérogin, Francis Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05292628.4 | 09.12.2005 | [2006/24] | Priority number, date | IL20040165728 | 12.12.2004 Original published format: IL 16572804 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1668997 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1668997 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A41B9/02 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
A41B9/023 (EP,US);
A41B9/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/13] |
Former [2006/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Männliche Unterhose mit Schutztasche | [2006/24] | English: | Male undergarment with protective pouch | [2006/24] | French: | Sous-vêtement masculin avec une poche de protection | [2006/24] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/45] | 24.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.02.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.02.2007 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2459043 (PAUL OWENBY, et al) [A] 1-27 * column 2, line 21 - column 4, line 8; figures 1-6 *; | [A]CH305697 (KAELIN KASPAR DR [CH]) [A] 1-27 * page 1, line 15 - page 2, line 74; figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB960367 (ROBERT SHAW & COMPANY LTD) [A] 1-27* page 1, line 70 - page 2, line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US3499442 (STEINMETZ WILLIAM A) [X] 1,4-6,9,12,13,15,18,20,21 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 20; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5029345 (ANGHELUTA ALEXANDRU [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,12,15,18,20-22,25,27 * column 2, line 15 - column 6, line 68; figures 1-6 * | by applicant | US3517666 | US6026517 | WO0045655 | US6295651 |