EP1552892 - Machine for straightening metal bands [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAI CLECIM 51, rue Sibert 42400 Saint-Chamond / FR | [2005/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mondiere, André 35 Rue du Belvédère 42650 Saint Jean Bonnefonds / FR | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Fischer, Michael, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/28] | Catherine, Alain, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05300003.0 | 04.01.2005 | [2005/28] | Priority number, date | FR20040050021 | 06.01.2004 Original published format: FR 0450021 | [2005/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1552892 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1552892 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B21D1/05 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
B21D1/05 (EP,US);
B21B13/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, IT [2006/14] |
Former [2005/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Richten von Metallbändern | [2005/28] | English: | Machine for straightening metal bands | [2005/28] | French: | Machine de planage d'une bande metallique | [2005/28] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 22.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPS63149017 ; | [A]US4074555 (NOE OSKAR) [A] 1,22* column 2, line 62 - line 68 *; | [AD]JPS63149017 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [AD] 1,22,24 * figure - * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881026), vol. 0124, no. 04, Database accession no. (M - 757), & JP63149017 A 19880621 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [AD] 1,22,24 * abstract * |